Case Information: 44694 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. MCLEMORE (MARK) C/W 43676 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 43676 *, 44694 | Related Case(s): | 42491 , 43676 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C187793 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/12/2005 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-03063 | |
03/01/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is not a fast track appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
03/09/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-04663 | |
03/23/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
03/29/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals. These are appeals from order of the district court granting respondents Graves' and McLemore's motion for a new trial. Pursuant to NRAP 3(b), these appeals are hereby consolidated for all appellate purposes. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief submitted by State and received in this court on March 29, 2005. Respondents Graves and McLemore shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve their answering briefs. Nos. 43676/44694. (05-06170) | ||
03/29/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 43676/44694. (Opening Brief filed in No. 43676). (05-06171) | ||
03/29/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 43676/44694. (Appendix filed in No. 43676). (05-06174) | ||
04/01/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. In 44694. Nos. 43676/44694 (05-06547). | ||
04/18/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent McLemore. Nos. 43676/44694 (05-07451). | ||
05/02/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Graves in 43676. Nos. 43676/44694 (05-08619). | ||
06/03/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 43676/44694. (05-10986) | ||
07/12/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 43676 / 44694. (05-13741) | ||
07/12/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Nos. 43676/44694. | ||
11/15/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP. Nos. 43676/44694. | 05-22408 | |
12/13/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-23307 | |
12/13/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 15, 2005. | 05-23307 |