Case Information: 44693 | |||
Short Caption: | TROTTER (JERMAINE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42928 , 45078 , 46027 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179034 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-03059 | |
03/22/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-05553 | |
04/19/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-06124 | |
04/19/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/05/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2005. | 05-06124 |