judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN M. KING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0914
Short Caption:JOHN M. KING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12559-88Filed Date:09/07/1989

Opening Event Date:09/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn M. King N
Donald F. O'Connor NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KING, JOHN M. UNITED STATES
09/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONALD F. O'CONNOR, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
11/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (141 PGS. -- TANNER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
01/10/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/10/1990ORDER GRANT MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND DISMISS APPEAL. GW PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD V
01/10/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD