judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROOSEVELT BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0904
Short Caption:ROOSEVELT BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12614-88Filed Date:06/27/1989

Opening Event Date:06/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoosevelt Brown N
April L. DownsYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, ROOSEVELT UNITED STATES
06/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) APRIL L. DOWNS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD CHECK
10/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 20 DAY EXTENSION AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD BA
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD V
12/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (20 PGS - TANNER) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990AFFIRMED GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AF SEPIGHT V. US, NO. 85-385 (EN BANC; FO JMT AFFIRMED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTED 28K CITATION TO PANEL. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD