judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IRVING MCGEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0906
Short Caption:IRVING MCGEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14762-88Filed Date:07/05/1989

Opening Event Date:07/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/18/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/25/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/16/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/30/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIrving Mcgee N
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Cynthia G. Wright YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCGEE, IRVING UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/27/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 8/21/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 9/25/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT, IF NOTE - 02 ANY, DUE BY 10/15/91; SCHED NOTE - 03 CASE ON JAN 1992 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 03
07/05/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. HART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD CHECK
10/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD U
12/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(6 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD RT
12/18/1989RECORD COMPLETED
06/27/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 062191 SCHPRD V
08/21/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGIUST 23, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 082191 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1991RECEIVED APLT BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF; LODGED BRF OF APLT IS FL. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD V
09/25/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/16/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/30/1992MANDATE ISSUED