judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE KNIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0887
Short Caption:TYRONE KNIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 89-CF-0454 Consolidated:89-CF-0887
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10319-88Filed Date:07/10/1989

Opening Event Date:07/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/1992
Argued/Submitted:12/02/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/27/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone Knight N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Demaurice F. Smith YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KNIGHT, TYRONE UNITED STATES
01/01/1902TP MXBA FILED 2/18/92 TO MXBA FILED 2/26/92 TO MLBA FILED 2/28/92
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTHONY HAMMOND NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 1/27/92 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 02 TO CONS 89-454 & 89-887; GRANT NOTE - 03 MO OF APLT IN 89-454 TO EXT TM NOTE - 03 & CLK TO FL APLT'S BRF IN 89- NOTE - 04 454; BRF OF APLT IN 89-887 NOTE - 04 REMAINS DUE TO BE FL BY 1/28; NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLT IN 89-887 IS FL. NOTE - 06 CON 89-454 NOTE - 06
07/10/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/08/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-454(204 PGS-GOAD) PANEL SCDATE 122389 SCHPRD RT
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD R
09/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(196 PGS-HUNT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD CHECK
10/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-29-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/29/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 19, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BR, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD U
02/13/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(132 PGS/GOAD) IN 89-454 PANEL SCDATE 122591 SCHPRD RT
12/19/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 AND BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.AC PANELRBH SCDATE 021391 SCHPRD U
12/26/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH 89-454 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-454. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011092 SCHPRD TT
02/05/1992ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FILED IN 10 OR VACATE CJA ATTR. AC PANELRO SCDATE 013092 SCHPRD K
02/18/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/25/92 PMB PANEL SCDATE 021792 SCHPRD BA
02/26/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1992RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1992ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief of appellant is filed. F/O the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court on or before May 5, 1992. (JEP)
03/25/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF for aplt in 89-887.
05/05/1992APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to May 7, 1992 (no oppo).
05/07/1992RECEIVED appellee's brief
05/20/1992ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief of appellee is filed. F/O that these cases shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
05/20/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/20/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/07/1992FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
12/02/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/02/1992ARGUED ST SC KG Richard Huber, Esq. for appellant (Hammond); Betty M. Hunter, Esq. for appellant (Knight); Demaurice F. Smith, Esq. for appellee.
12/22/1992AFFIRMED: MOJ affirming convictions on appeal.
01/27/1993MANDATE ISSUED