judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYLVANIA GARCES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0886
Short Caption:SYLVANIA GARCES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12618-88Filed Date:08/31/1989

Opening Event Date:08/31/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/30/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSylvania Garces N
Dale Chance Saliba YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GARCES, SYLVANIA UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 05/02/90 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 TO REMAND & THIS CASE IS NOTE - 02 HEREBY REMANDED TO THE TRIAL NOTE - 02 COURT FOR PURPOSE OF REISSUING NOTE - 03 THE TRIAL COURT'S ORD VACATING NOTE - 03 THE JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING NOTE - 04 THE INDICTMENT. NOTE - 04
08/31/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DALE C. SALIBA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD R
10/30/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (4 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAY AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD U
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (81-PGS/MOORE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020690 SCHPRD RT
02/07/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #(51 PGS. -- CURLEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD RT
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD BA
03/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/02/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THUR 4 GW PANELRO SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD V
05/02/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT GARCES MOT TO DIS APPEAL JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD