judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER E. LEWIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0478
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER E. LEWIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1220-87Filed Date:04/27/1988

Opening Event Date:04/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/21/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher E. Lewis N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Charles M. Steele YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEWIS, CHRISTOPHER E. UNITED STATES
04/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD R
06/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (199 PGS - TANNER) JB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD RT
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS OR UNTIL 9/15/88 RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 9/15/88 - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081888 SCHPRD M
09/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD BA
10/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 21ST JB DAS PANEL SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/21/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD BE
05/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/09/1989SUBMITTED PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD