judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EOLUS DAVIS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1009
Short Caption:EOLUS DAVIS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1986-89Filed Date:08/02/1989

Opening Event Date:08/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/11/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEolus Davis, Jr.N
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Rene Y. Webb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS JR., EOLUS UNITED STATES
08/02/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 090789 SCHPRD DSA
12/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD R
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(83 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (103 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-28-90 AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD BA
03/05/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA UP TO AND INCLUDING 3/28/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/12/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD B
04/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 4, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050190 SCHPRD BE
05/04/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/11/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990ORDER GRANTING MOTION & DIRG CLK TO FILE APLE'S LODGED BR; FO CASE TO BE SCH ASAP. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELFETEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELFETEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD