Case: 13-05-00165-CV
13-05-00165-CV
03/09/2005
Mandamus
In Re: Cappadonna Electrical Mgmt, et al.
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/05/2006 | Record sent to storage | | |||
04/28/2006 | Record Sent | | |||
12/01/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Dismissed as Moot | | ||
12/01/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Dismissed as Moot | | ||
12/01/2005 | Opinion issued | conditionally granted |
| ||
12/01/2005 | Writ Disposed | conditionally granted | | ||
11/29/2005 | Letter sent | | |||
11/14/2005 | Response to _____________. | | |||
11/09/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |||
11/03/2005 | Post submission brief filed | | |||
10/26/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/26/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/26/2005 | Reply to _______ | | |||
10/26/2005 | Supplement filed | | |||
10/26/2005 | Response to _____________. | | |||
10/26/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
10/26/2005 | Addtl Copies of Appearance of Counsel | | |||
10/26/2005 | Letter filed | | |||
10/25/2005 | Appearance of Counsel | | |||
10/25/2005 | Letter sent | | |||
10/24/2005 | Motion Emergency | | |||
10/21/2005 | Motion to Stay | | |||
08/22/2005 | Letter sent | | |||
07/14/2005 | Appendix filed | | |||
07/14/2005 | Reply to _______ | | |||
06/27/2005 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
06/08/2005 | Submitted | | |||
06/07/2005 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
06/02/2005 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |||
05/23/2005 | Supplemental citation | | |||
05/18/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/29/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
04/26/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
04/26/2005 | Opposition filed | | |||
04/26/2005 | Submission | | |||
04/18/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
04/14/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/12/2005 | Submission | | |||
03/31/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/31/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/31/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/31/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/31/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/31/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/31/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/28/2005 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
03/28/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/24/2005 | Record checked out | | |||
03/24/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/24/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/23/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/23/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/23/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/23/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/21/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/15/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/15/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/11/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/11/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/11/2005 | Joinder to _______ | | |||
03/10/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/10/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/10/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/10/2005 | Writ Filed | | |||
03/10/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/10/2005 | Motion to Stay | | |||
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/09/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |||
03/09/2005 | Writ Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/01/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Metro Electric | Relator | Beth Watkins Squires K. Blake Coffee |
Commercial Roofing Systems | Real Parties | Roger C. Davie Hon. Cindy A. Garcia |
Durrant Architect, Inc. | Relator | Brent A. Biggs David P. Benjamin |
CTO, Inc. | Relator | Hon. Ricardo R. Reyna Robert A. Pollom Hon. John A. Guerra Thomas A. Mailloux Hon. Nissa M. Dunn |
Landmark Organization | Real Parties | Todd A. Hunter John E. Pipkin |
Pearland Industries, Inc. | Real Parties | Katherine M. Willis Hon. Robert A. Allen |
Raba-Kistner Consultants | Real Parties | Mr. Richard Wayne Avery |
AFG Industries, Inc. | Real Parties | James M. Bettis, Jr. |
Eberle Materials | Relator | Fred L. Shuchart Hon. Cindy A. Garcia Jaime Balli |
Al Cardenas Masonry and System Firealarm CCTV Central Systems | Relator | Hon. Keith C. Livesay Hon. Moises R. Hernandez Hon. Miguel Salinas |
Strategis Equipment/Gernsbacher | Real Parties | Scott Lyford |
Lyon Metal Products | Real Parties | Mark R. Stein |
Cornerstone Detention Products | Real Parties | G. Steven Henry |
Buell Doors d/b/a Total Opening System | Real Parties | Viola Garza |
Rio Grande Steel, Ltd. | Real Parties | Hon. Jack C. Partridge |
MacLaird Glass Company | Real Parties | Hon. Ewing E. Sikes III |
Thirlwall Sheet Metal Company | Real Parties | Hon. Dana R. Allison |
Cameron County | Real Parties | Hon. Jane M.N. Webre Hon. Benigno Trey Martinez |
Coastal Engineering | Relator | Hon. Jose L. Gamez Hon. Clay Coalson |
Toft/Wolff/Farrow, Inc. | Relator | Hon. Daniel G. Gurwitz Gary R. Gurwitz Martin S. Schexnayder Steve Sonsik Hwang |
Di Stefano/Santopetero Architects, Inc. | Real Parties | Elizabeth G. Nealy Hon. Liza Michelle Vasquez-Garza |
Cappadonna Electrical Mgmt. | Relator | Hon. Frank E. Weathered Hon. Lawrence Coffey |
Toman & Associates | Real Parties | Hon. Anthony B. James |
Zarate Suspended Ceilings, Inc. | Relator | Hon. Ricardo R. Reyna Robert A. Pollom Hon. Nissa M. Dunn Thomas A. Mailloux Hon. John A. Guerra |
L&G Concrete | Relator | Robert Moran R. E. Lopez, Jr. |
Tri City Steel and Fabrication, Inc. | Relator | Craig A. Nevelow Lisa M. Doering |
J-III Concrete Company, Inc. | Relator | Timothy B. Poteet |
Trial Court Information
404th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Abel C. Limas
2004-02-1208-G