judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES I. BRIGGS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0977
Short Caption:JAMES I. BRIGGS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7308-81Filed Date:07/13/1989

Opening Event Date:07/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen G. Milliken NN
Amicus-AppellantJohn Doe N
Curt S. HansenYN
AppellantJames I. Briggs N
James W. KleinNY
Carol S. Steiker NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James A. Meade YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRIGGS, JAMES I. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/1/90 ORD: THE 9/1/89 ORDER NOTE - 01 IS VACATED CAUSE HAVING BEEN NOTE - 02 SHOWN. FO THAT THE BRIEF OF NOTE - 02 THE AMICUS CURIAE APPEARING ON NOTE - 03 BEHALF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 03 W/I 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 04 ORDER AND APLE'S BRIEF 30 DAYS NOTE - 04 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 05 08/20/90 ORD: GRANTG COUNS MO NOTE - 05 & DIRECTG CLK TO SUBSTITUTE NOTE - 06 APPEARNACE OF CURT S. HANSEN, NOTE - 06 ESQ, ON THIS CASE ON BEHALF OF NOTE - 07 THE POSITION OF COUNSL AMICUS NOTE - 07 CURIAE BELOW, IN THE STEAD OF NOTE - 08 STEPHEN G. MILLIKEN, ESQ. NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HANSENC FOR - AMICUS CURIAE A ATTY 2 - STEIKERC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 3 - MEADEJA FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 MILLIKENS WITHDRAW 08/20/90
07/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (12 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD R
09/01/1989ORDER AMICUS TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED;SEE GIVENS V. GOLDSTEIN DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD Q
09/11/1989ANSWER/RESPONSE OF AMICUS CURIAE TO THIS COURT'S 9/1/89 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. PB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD ANS
10/10/1989AMICUS CURIAE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS FROM DECISION ON SHOW CAUSE ISSUE (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (219-PGS/MILLER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(51 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1-4 GW PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD VS
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (4 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990AMICUS CURIAE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 10 ADDITONAL DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD BAC
03/15/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF AC TO FILE BRIEF; AC BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD V
03/26/1990AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BAC
04/26/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 24, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG FVH PANEL SCDATE 042590 SCHPRD BE
04/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF COUNSEL FOR AMICUS & SUB- STITUTION OF CURTIS S. HANSEN AS COUNSEL FOR AMICUS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CURT S. HANSEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 THRU 08 GW PANELBE SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD K
11/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/07/1990ARGUED PANELBESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991DISMISSED ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PANELSTMKBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 597 A.2d 370
09/24/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 2776 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0000
10/16/1991LETTER OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD