Case: 13-07-00592-CR
13-07-00592-CR
10/01/2007
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
CHRISTOPHER JAMES GREGORY
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/18/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
02/19/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/2008 | Case stored | | |||||
08/04/2008 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
07/30/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
05/08/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
05/07/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
04/16/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/18/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
02/19/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/19/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
02/12/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/01/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/20/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/10/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
11/08/2007 | Original exhibits filed | | |||||
11/08/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
11/01/2007 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/25/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
10/02/2007 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |||||
10/01/2007 | Motion filed | | |||||
10/01/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/30/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gregory, Christopher James | Criminal - Appellant | Lawrence D. Elliott |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Stephen B. Tyler Hon. W. A. 'Bill' White |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Robert C. Cheshire
05-1-21,507-A
6 Yrs TDCl + $1,000 Fine + $285 Ct Costs