judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANDY FARMER, d/b/a RANDY FARMER CONSTRUCTION, a sole proprietorship v. EDWIN R. RICKARD and ELIZABETH A. RICKARD, Trustees under the Elizabeth A. Rickard Living Trust

Case Heading (06-132)
Case Number:06-132Case Docketed On:06/12/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:RANDY FARMER, d/b/a RANDY FARMER CONSTRUCTION, a sole proprietorship v. EDWIN R. RICKARD and ELIZABETH A. RICKARD, Trustees under the Elizabeth A. Rickard Living Trust
Full Title:RANDY FARMER, d/b/a RANDY FARMER CONSTRUCTION, a sole proprietorship, Appellant (Defendant), v. EDWIN R. RICKARD and ELIZABETH A. RICKARD, Trustees under the Elizabeth A. Rickard Living Trust, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRandy FarmerJay A. Gilbertz
Michael K. Davis
AppelleeEdwin R. RickardLaurence W. Stinson
Bradley D. Bonner
AppelleeElizabeth A. RickardLaurence W. Stinson
Bradley D. Bonner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 19
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/12/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/12/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended index from district court clerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/25/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
09/07/2006Brief - Appellee (captioned as reply brief); received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
09/15/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/28/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/19/2006Event - Oral argument presented at UW Law School before full court (Jay A. Gilbertz for appellant; Laurence W. Stinson for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/31/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal