judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ISAIAH J. GREENE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0830
Short Caption:ISAIAH J. GREENE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-22107-09Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/28/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIsaiah J. Greene Y
Sicilia C. EnglertYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Helenanne Listerman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia Englert, Esquire
07/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
07/26/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (339 pgs/McCarn) 4/12 & 14/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (43 pgs/Allison) 4/13/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (141 pgs/White) 4/19/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (65 pgs/White) 4/20/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (20 pgs/tape) 6/24/10 proc. cd attached
10/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/08/2010RECORD COPIES
10/08/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (SEALED documents)'
11/15/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2 wks. no oppo
11/19/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 30, 2010. (JAC)
11/22/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/22/2010APPENDIX
12/27/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days no oppo
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 26, 2011. (JAC)
01/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of May 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by MAR. 25, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/28/2011FiledARGUED before Washington,Oberly,Farrell. SICILLIA C.ENGLERT Esq.,for appellant. Helenanne Listerman Esq.,for appellee.
07/14/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/05/2011FiledMandate