judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. R. DAVIS, INC., ET AL. v. STATE OF TEXAS

Case: A-54
A-54
02/07/1944
Application for Writ of Error
W. R. DAVIS, INC., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/15/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/13/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/11/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/05/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/10/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/03/1944Letter Filed
05/19/1944Response to Motion filed
05/15/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/11/1944Response to Brief filed
04/05/1944Supplemental Brief filed
03/01/1944Submission reset
02/23/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/23/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/10/1944Response to Petition
02/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. R. Davis, Inc., et al.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information