judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEHUA ENTERPRISES VS. GRANT

Case Information: 36247
Short Caption:LEHUA ENTERPRISES VS. GRANTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385194Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/20/2000 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stephenson & Dickinson--check no. 2367.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09740
06/20/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. called for signed verification. 00-10933
06/29/2000Other Other. Received signed verification page of docket sheet and placed in correspondence file.
07/31/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 28, 2000. 00-13223
08/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-15109
08/28/2000Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 00-15110
08/28/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-15111
09/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in these matters and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-16167
09/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.