judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENISE KAY PRICKETT, n/k/a DENISE KAY WENDELIN v. BRADLEY KENT PRICKETT

Case Heading (06-282)
Case Number:06-282Case Docketed On:12/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DENISE KAY PRICKETT, n/k/a DENISE KAY WENDELIN v. BRADLEY KENT PRICKETT
Full Title:DENISE KAY PRICKETT, n/k/a DENISE KAY WENDELIN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BRADLEY KENT PRICKETT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDenise Kay PrickettEric E. Jones
AppelleeBradley Kent PrickettRonald G. Pretty

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 153
Citation:167 P.3d 661

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/25/2007Brief - Appellant. Contacted counsel for method of service - by mail.BriefAppellantFinal
01/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/01/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from Ron Pretty's assistant. Mr. Pretty will represent the appellee and will file entry of appearance.EventPhone CallFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Ron Pretty for appellee.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/13/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/25/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/11/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/15/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal