judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEO CARLTON WEEKES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0831
Short Caption:LEO CARLTON WEEKES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2937-08Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/13/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/08/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeo Carton WeekesY
Darlene C. Jackson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Andrea L. Hertzfeld YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian Greenspun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian Greenspun, Esquire
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt orderd/needed)dfe
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (236pgs/Ramos) 6/15-16/10 proc. (missing portions of 6/15/10 proc.)dfe
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (37pgs/Tape) 6/29/10 proc. w/CD
10/22/2010RECORD INDEX
10/22/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/01/2010APPEARANCE of Darlene Jackson as counsel for aplt
11/04/2010RECEIVED supp motion for appeal.
11/15/2010ORDERED: Sua sponte, that the appointment of Julian Greenspan, Esquire, is hereby vacated. Julian Greenspan, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appeared counsel forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
11/15/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Denied as Moot
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until completion of transcripts (no oppo) (Titled: Aplt's motion for stay...)
12/01/2010ORD DNY COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON as moot. (By: ETW)
01/13/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant and limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (By: JAC)
01/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (17pgs/Tape) 6/15/10 proc. (missing prtion) w/CD
01/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 13, 2011, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
02/24/2011ORDERED: That Seth Schrager, Esquire, is hereby directed to transfer the file within 10 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that the appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/04/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
04/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/7/11
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/07/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/07/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/08/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Reid
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Reid, Associate Judge, Retired.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate