Case: 04-91-00186-CR
04-91-00186-CR
04/11/1981
Robbery
Walker, Wendell Dwayne
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/11/1993 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
05/04/1993 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
06/22/1992 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
06/22/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/22/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/16/1992 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
05/20/1992 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
03/30/1992 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
03/26/1992 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
03/06/1992 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
02/03/1992 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
12/31/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/31/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/18/1991 | Submitted | | |
12/18/1991 | Submission | | |
12/18/1991 | Submitted | | |
11/19/1991 | Submission | | |
11/08/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
11/08/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/08/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/16/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
09/09/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/06/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/16/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
08/09/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/02/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
06/12/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/06/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
05/17/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
05/17/1991 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/17/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
04/29/1991 | Motion Filed | | |
04/03/1991 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | | |
04/03/1991 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/11/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/02/2015 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
06/22/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel Thornberry |
Walker, Wendell Dwayne | Criminal - Appellant | Ed Kidwell Wendell Walker |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon S Macrae
89-CR-1784-B
Fifty (50) years