Case: 05-05-01639-CR
05-05-01639-CR
12/08/2005
Other Felony
Capetillo, Daniel Alacio
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/23/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/23/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/30/2005 | Record due | | |
12/28/2005 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
12/28/2005 | Record Retention | Retain | |
12/28/2005 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
12/27/2005 | Submission | | |
12/27/2005 | Submitted | | |
12/15/2005 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal | | |
12/09/2005 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
12/08/2005 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
12/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/08/2005 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/01/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/31/2005 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/22/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Daniel Alcacio Capetillo | Criminal - Appellant | Deborah Brown Harrison |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John R. Roach |
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
219-82264-04
10 Yrs TDCJ/$1000 Fine