judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AUTOZONE DEVELOPMENT CORP. ET AL. V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-0822
Short Caption:AUTOZONE DEVELOPMENT CORP. ET AL. V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:10-CV-0822Consolidated: 10-CV-1205
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR3108-07Filed Date:06/30/2010

Opening Event Date:06/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAutozone Development CorporationN
Steven A. PozefskyNY
AppellantAutozone Stores Inc.N
Steven A. PozefskyNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/7/10 & 5/5/10) (elp)
07/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (54-pgs/tape 5/5/10 proc.)
07/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (106-pgs/tape 6/7/10 proc.)w/cd
07/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/28/2010RECORD INDEX
08/02/2010 ORDERED that appellants shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed either for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order.... OR for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
08/02/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/23/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
11/02/2010 ORDERED that the SHOW CAUSE ORDER IN APPEAL NO. 10CV822 IS HEREBY VACATED. It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL NOS. 10CV822 & 10CV1205 ARE CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is ****MORE****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED... It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA's MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mg't Inc. v. Nt'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914 (DC 1979). It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal are hereby AFFIRMED. (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED