St Vs James B Chadwell II | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | ||||
Rr 6 Box 7 H1 Bunker Hill, IN 46914 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Bruce Carter Embrey
765-863-1188(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B, II | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | BATTERY RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJU- | N/A | 35-42-2-1(a)(3) | Felony C | 04/01/2000 |
05/03/2000 | Converted Event Docket Note: PROB | ||
---|---|---|---|
05/03/2000 | Converted Event Docket Level Entry: Entry/Fee - Book: 18 Page: | ||
05/03/2000 | Converted Event INFORMATION FILED: TLR (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/03/2000 | ||
05/04/2000 | Converted Event WARRANT ISSUED. TLR (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/04/2000 | ||
02/12/2009 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Eric D. Huneryager, files Motion to Dismiss, together with Certificate of Service. mp (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/12/2009 | ||
02/13/2009 | Judgment 1. BATTERY RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJU- Dismissed | ||
02/17/2009 | Converted Event Motion to Dismiss submitted and approved. CAUSE DISMISSED. mp (DISPOSED: DI ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/13/2009 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52C01-0005-CF-000039 | Chadwell, James B, II | 05/03/2000 Miami Circuit Court | CF - Criminal Felony Decided |
|