St Vs James B Chadwell II | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | Michael Edward Boonstra Public Defender
574-753-4147(W) | |||
Miami Meadows Apt 10 Bunker Hill, IN 46914 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Bruce Carter Embrey
765-863-1188(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B, II | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | BATTERY RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJU- | N/A | 35-42-2-1(a)(3) | Felony C | 03/06/2000 |
04/06/2000 | Converted Event Docket Note: PROB | ||
---|---|---|---|
04/06/2000 | Converted Event Docket Level Entry: Entry/Fee - Book: 18 Page: | ||
04/06/2000 | Converted Event INFORMATION FILED: tlr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/06/2000 | ||
04/06/2000 | Converted Event Defendant appears, State apepars by Jeffrey Sinkovics. Initial hearing held and entry fo not guilty entered. Jury trial set for August 21, 2000 at 9:00 A.M. Jury status set for August 7, 2000 at 8:00 A.M. Pre-trial set for June 1, 2000 at 1:00 P.M. Public Defender appointed. ssg (KLS) (RJO? N) (Alt Judge T ) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/06/2000 | ||
04/12/2000 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by W L Siders, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/12/2000 | ||
04/14/2000 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by W L Siders, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/14/2000 | ||
04/19/2000 | Converted Event Michael Boonstra files Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendant, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/19/2000 | ||
05/05/2000 | Converted Event State of Indiana by W.L. Siders files State's Supplemental Discovery together with Certificate of Service. cfw (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/05/2000 | ||
05/12/2000 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. cfw (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/12/2000 | ||
05/15/2000 | Converted Event Motion granted. Pre-trial continued to June 29th, 2000 at 1:00 p.m. and Jury Status continued to August 14th, 2000 at 8:00 a.m. jh (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/15/2000 | ||
06/01/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) Hearing Code: (D) | ||
06/29/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
06/30/2000 | Converted Event Defendant fails to apper. State appears by Wil Siders. Court issues a bench warrant for arrest of defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. cfs (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/29/2000 | ||
08/07/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: STATUS HEARING (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) Hearing Code: (D) | ||
08/14/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: STATUS HEARING (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
08/16/2000 | Converted Event State appears by Wil Siders. Defendant fails to appear and Court now issues a bench warrant for the arrest of defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. cfs (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/14/2000 | ||
08/21/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: JURY TRIAL (Time: 09:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
02/12/2009 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Eric D. Huneryager, files Motion to Dismiss, together with Certificate of Service. mp (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/12/2009 | ||
02/13/2009 | Judgment 1. BATTERY RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJU- Dismissed | ||
02/17/2009 | Converted Event Motion to Dismiss submitted and approved. CAUSE DISMISSED. mp (DISPOSED: DI ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/13/2009 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52C01-0004-CF-000030 | Chadwell, James B, II | 04/06/2000 Miami Circuit Court | CF - Criminal Felony Decided |
|