State Of Indiana Vs James B. Chadwell, Ii | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | Derick Wade Steele Retained
** Confidential Phone Number ** | |||
1006 N Apperson WAY Kokomo, IN 46901 | |||||
Interested Person | Cass Sheriff | ||||
Probation Department | Probation Office | ||||
520 High ST Logansport, IN 46947 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | ||||
Charges: Chadwell, James B, II | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | Receiving Stolen property | 35-43-4-2 | Misdemeanor Class A | 05/09/2000 | |
Filed As: Reference CCS Entry | - | Degree Code | 05/09/2000 |
05/09/2000 | Converted Event State of Indiana files an Appearance form, together with information charging the Defendant with Count I, Receiving Stolen Property a Class D Felony, together with Probable Cause Affidavit. | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/2000 | Converted Event The Court having examined the Probable Cause Affidavit filed herein finds probable cause for the immediate arrest of defendant. Bench warrant ordered issued. Bond set at $1,000.00 cash or $5,000.00 surety. | ||||||||||
05/09/2000 | Converted Event Book 1 Page 0 Vol./Book 1, Page 0 | ||||||||||
05/09/2000 | Converted Event RECEIV STOL PROPERTY | ||||||||||
05/12/2000 | Converted Event Bench warrant entered. | ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry Defendant present on return of warrant. Initial hearing held. Advise of rights given. Defendant advised of pending charges and possible penalties. Preliminary plea of not guilty entered on behalf of the defendant. Court Order on Discovery and Trial Settings. Bond: $1000 cash/$5000 surety.
| ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Indigent Counsel Appointed at County Expense | ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 05/02/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Final PreTrial Conference scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
03/14/2016 | Administrative Event Defendant is given OR release.
| ||||||||||
03/18/2016 | Appearance Filed
| ||||||||||
05/02/2016 | Pretrial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
05/04/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Defendant fails to appear for pretrial conference. Bench Warrant ordered issued. No bond. Defense will file Motion to Dismiss. Hearing dates previously set remains on the court's calendar.
| ||||||||||
05/04/2016 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | ||||||||||
05/05/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry On oral motion of the defense, the warrant is recalled and hearing is set on May 12, 2016 at 9am. Defendant to appear.
| ||||||||||
05/05/2016 | Order Recalling Warrant
| ||||||||||
05/05/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 05/12/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
05/05/2016 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Recalled | ||||||||||
05/12/2016 | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
05/12/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) On motion of defense set further hearing on June 9, 2016 at 9am.
| ||||||||||
05/13/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
05/13/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 9:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Other. | ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Final PreTrial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) Other | ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2016 at 9:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Dismissal / Judgment. | ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Plea Agreement Filed
| ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Order Issued (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Guilty plea and Sentencing Order.
| ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Conditions of Probation | ||||||||||
06/09/2016 | Judgment (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C) 1. Receiving Stolen property Plea by Agreement | ||||||||||
06/10/2016 | Amended Judgment (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C) Reason: Other 1. Receiving Stolen property Plea by Agreement | ||||||||||
06/10/2016 | Sentenced (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C) 1. Receiving Stolen property | ||||||||||
06/28/2016 | CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) Dismissal / Judgment | ||||||||||
08/19/2016 | Notice of Violation of Probation Count 1.
| ||||||||||
08/19/2016 | Administrative Event Court sets hearing on Sept. 2, 2016 at 8am. Notice ordered.
| ||||||||||
08/19/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Violation of Probation scheduled for 09/02/2016 at 8:00 AM. | ||||||||||
09/02/2016 | Hearing on Violation of Probation (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
09/02/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry Initial hearing held on violation of Probation. Defendant will retain private counsel.
| ||||||||||
09/02/2016 | Advisement of Rights Conducted | ||||||||||
09/02/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Fact Finding Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
09/29/2016 | Fact Finding Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
09/30/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Defendant fails to appear for fact finding. Bench Warrant ordered issued.
| ||||||||||
09/30/2016 | Order Issuing Warrant for Arrest (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) FTA No bond
| ||||||||||
09/30/2016 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | ||||||||||
11/02/2016 | Appearance Filed Appearance for Defendant
| ||||||||||
11/02/2016 | Motion Filed Motion to Rescind Warrant and Issue Summons
| ||||||||||
11/02/2016 | Administrative Event Motion to Rescind Warrant and Issue Summons is denied by the Court.
| ||||||||||
11/08/2016 | Motion Filed Objection
| ||||||||||
11/21/2016 | Administrative Event Defendant's Motion to Rescind Warrant is denied (11/2/16) | ||||||||||
11/21/2016 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Initial hearing held on probation violation, Count 1. Status hearing set for 12/28/16 at 9 a.m. Court is inclined to set an earlier hearing if counsel for defendant is available.
| ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Advisement of Rights Conducted (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) | ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Order Issued (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Defendant remanded back to CCJ and held with no bond.
| ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 11/28/2016 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Administrative Event State by Tom Lupke, contacts the court and advises he has spoken to counsel for the Defendant and that the State and Probation Officer Jill Van Horn agree to an OR release of the defendant from the CCJ. | ||||||||||
11/22/2016 | Order Issued (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) Defendant ORd from CCJ.
| ||||||||||
11/28/2016 | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perrone, Thomas C) | ||||||||||
11/28/2016 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Perrone, Thomas C ) On motion of defense, set further hearing on 3/2/17 at 9 a.m.
| ||||||||||
11/28/2016 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 03/02/2017 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
03/02/2017 | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Muehlhausen, James) | ||||||||||
03/02/2017 | Hearing Journal Entry On motion of defense reset hearing on April 6, 2017 at 9am. Counsel to notify defendant.
| ||||||||||
03/02/2017 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Fact Finding Hearing scheduled for 04/06/2017 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
04/05/2017 | Motion Filed Defendant's Motion to Continue
| ||||||||||
04/05/2017 | Administrative Event Court staff contacts prosecutor's office to see if they object to a continuance. State agrees with a continuance. Court lifts the fact finding and will reset the hearing. | ||||||||||
04/05/2017 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Fact Finding Hearing scheduled for 04/06/2017 at 9:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Other. | ||||||||||
04/06/2017 | CANCELED Fact Finding Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Muehlhausen, James) Other | ||||||||||
04/07/2017 | Order Granting Motion for Continuance
| ||||||||||
04/07/2017 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Fact Finding Hearing scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||
04/27/2017 | Fact Finding Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Muehlhausen, James) | ||||||||||
04/27/2017 | Order Issued on Violation of Probation. Defendant admits Count 1.
| ||||||||||
05/10/2017 | Petition Filed for Unsuccessful Termination of Probation and Judgment
| ||||||||||
05/11/2017 | Administrative Event Court sets hearing on 5/25/17 at 3:45 p.m. Notice directed to Defendant; Sheriff service | ||||||||||
05/11/2017 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 3:45 PM. | ||||||||||
05/11/2017 | Notice of Hearing Issued | ||||||||||
05/12/2017 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/11/2017 : Probation Office | ||||||||||
05/12/2017 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/11/2017 : Derick Wade Steele | ||||||||||
05/25/2017 | Status Conference (3:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Muehlhausen, James) | ||||||||||
05/26/2017 | Hearing Journal Entry Status hearing conducted on May 25, 2017. Order of Unsuccessful Termination and Judgment Of Probation. Status hearing is reset for October 19, 2017 at 3:45 p.m. Defendant notified in open Court. | ||||||||||
05/26/2017 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 3:45 PM. | ||||||||||
05/27/2017 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 5/26/2017 : Probation Office Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/26/2017 : Probation Office | ||||||||||
05/27/2017 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 5/26/2017 : Derick Wade Steele Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/26/2017 : Derick Wade Steele | ||||||||||
10/19/2017 | Status Conference (3:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Muehlhausen, James) | ||||||||||
10/19/2017 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Muehlhausen, James ) Defendant does not appear. No further hearing set.
| ||||||||||
10/19/2017 | Order Issued (Judicial Officer: Muehlhausen, James ) Pursuant to IC 33-37-2-3(d)(1).
| ||||||||||
10/21/2017 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/19/2017 : Derick Wade Steele;Probation Office |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09D01-0005-DF-000077 | Chadwell, James B, II | 05/09/2000 Cass Superior Court 1 | DF - CL D Felony or lesser charge Decided |
|