St V Chadwell | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | Male | |||
41044 Gunter Ct Peru, IN 46970 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | James Richard Fleming
765-452-1766(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B, II | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | DRIVING WHILE SUSPENDED INFRACTION REPEALED- | 37368 | 9-24-18-5a | Infraction Class A | 01/31/2000 |
02/01/2000 | Converted Event Traffic ticket filed. OLN: 1140-17-0282 DOB: 03/13/1979 (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/01/2000 | ||
---|---|---|---|
02/28/2000 | Converted Event TRANSFERRED FROM TRAFFIC COURT SESSION. Defendant appears and enters a plea of False. Trial now set for 4/11/2000 at 6:00 P.M. Defendant given appearance card. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/24/2000 | ||
04/11/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: BENCH TRIAL (Time: 18:00:00) (Judge: JW ) | ||
04/12/2000 | Converted Event State appears by Mark Hurt. Officer A.J. Arnett/KPD appears. Defendant appears in person for trial. All sworn. Officer Arnett testifies and identifies the Defendant. State moves to admit exhibit "A". Defendant does not Object. Exhibit "A" admitted without objection. Defendant testifies. State/Defense rests. Court finds the Defendant did commit the violation and fines the Defendant $1.50 plus costsa of $75.50 to be paid in full on or before 5/11/2000 at 4:00 P.M. JUDGMENT ON FINDING. (WILLIAM C MENGES, JUDGE PROTEMPORE.) (DISPOSED: BT ) (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/11/2000 | ||
08/16/2000 | Converted Event FTP. (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/16/2000 Vol./Book 4, Page 1 | ||
09/10/2009 | Disposition 1. DRIVING WHILE SUSPENDED INFRACTION REPEALED- Finding of Guilty | ||
09/14/2009 | Converted Event Received/Receipt number $77.00/27888. (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/14/2009 Vol./Book 14, Page 594 | ||
09/14/2009 | Converted Event SR16 ELECTRONICALLY SUBMITTED TO THE BMV. cag (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/14/2009 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
34D03-0002-IF-000326 | Chadwell, James B, II | 02/01/2000 Howard Superior Court 3 | IF - Infraction Decided |
|