judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE VENETIAN LIEN LITIGATION (HARMON, LIMITED)

Case Information: 36242
Short Caption:IN RE VENETIAN LIEN LITIGATION (HARMON, LIMITED)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36029 , 36030 , 36031 , 36032 , 36033 , 36157 , 36160 , 36161 , 36162 , 36163 , 36164 , 36165 , 36166 , 36232 , 36235 , 36236 , 36237 , 36238 , 36239 , 36240 , 36241 , 36243 , 36244 , 36245 , 36246 , 36581 , 37054 , 37245 , 37527 , 37546 , 37558 , 37670 , 37713 , 37792 , 38576 , 39928 , 41163 , 41332 , 42265
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397391
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A409193
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Leavitt, Sully & Rivers.
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 9548.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09721
06/13/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/21/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellants' Emergency Motion for Order to Stay Lien Foreclosure Proceedings. 00-10615
07/03/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Harmon, Ltd.'s Opposition to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Order to Stay Lien Foreclosure Proceedings and Joinder in Joint Opposition of Appellees' to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Order to Stay Lien Foreclosure Proceedings in Related Appeals and Joinder in Ebenisterie Beaubois, Ltee's Motion to Dismiss Venetian Resort's Improper Appeal as Void. 00-11306
07/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Harmon, Ltd.'s Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Venetian Casino Resort's Improper Appeal as Void. 00-12217
07/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Harmon, Ltd.'s Joinder in Ebenisterie Beaubois, Ltee's Motion to Dismiss Venetian Casino Resorts Improper Appeal as Void. 00-12221
12/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motions for Stay. We are not persuaded that stays pending appeals in these cases are warranted at this time. We deny appellants' motions. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157, 36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 32639, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246. 00-21720
02/14/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Conference Status Report from Settlement Judge Berkson. It is suggested that the Supreme Court consider the determination of the pending Motion to Dismiss. As of this date, settlement conferences are continuing. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157, 36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 36239, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246 and 36581 (01-02912).
03/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondents have filed motions to dismiss appellants' appeals. fn1[In Docket Nos. 36031, 36160, 36163, 36239, 36240, 36241, and 36242, respondents did not file formal motions to dismiss; instead, they filed joinders in respondent Ebenisterie Beaubois, Ltee's motion to dismiss, filed in Docket No. 36235. In all but one appeal (Docket No. 36240), appellants opposed these joinders. We construe their joinders as motions to dismiss. In Docket Nos. 36030, 36237, 36243, 36245, and 36581, respondents did not file motions to dismiss or joinders in other respondents' motions. Nevertheless, as these appeals present the same jurisdiction issues as all the other appeals, we have elected to address jurisdiction in all appeals.] As NRS 108.2275 does not authorize the instant appeals, we 'ORDER these appeals dismissed.' fn3[In light of this order, we vacate our prior notices of settlement conferences in these appeals.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157,36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 36239, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246, 36581. 01-04044
04/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04191
04/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. 01-04191