judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENISE SEHERR-THOSS v. ROGER SEHERR-THOSS

Case Heading (06-10)
Case Number:06-10Case Docketed On:01/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DENISE SEHERR-THOSS v. ROGER SEHERR-THOSS
Full Title:DENISE SEHERR-THOSS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROGER SEHERR-THOSS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDenise Seherr-ThossKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeRoger Seherr-ThossBret F. King

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/27/2006Brief - Appellant - no appendix.BriefAppellantFinal
03/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Attachment. Received copy of appendix to appellant's brief.Notice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
03/23/2006Motion - Consolidate. Filed motion to continue oral argument (in Case No. 05-237) and to consolidate arguments.MotionConsolidateFinal
03/24/2006Order - Consolidating cases. Filed order vacating setting for oral argument and order consolidating cases.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/10/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/25/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/05/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal. one volume. Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/23/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kenneth S. Cohen for appellant; Bret King for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/23/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/31/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/18/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/18/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/21/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal