judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. V. PATRICK T. HAND

Case Information: 10-CV-0823
Short Caption:HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. V. PATRICK T. HANDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC5015-09Filed Date:06/30/2010

Opening Event Date:06/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHartford Financial Service Group Inc.N
James W. NowakYY
AppelleePatrick T. Hand NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 30, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC)elp
07/22/2010RECORD INDEX
07/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/07/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/07/2010APPENDIX
10/07/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
10/07/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
11/09/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
11/09/2010 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of January 2011 through March 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by NOV. 22, 2010, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
01/21/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/30/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/30/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Ruiz, Glickman, Thompson James W. Nowak, Esq. for appellant Patrick T. Hand, Esq. for appellee
08/04/2011FiledMiscellaneous suggestion of death (M (Appellee)
10/27/2011FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired*) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded for further proceedings consistent withthe opinion.)
11/22/2011FiledMandate