judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRANK WEBB, ET AL. v. HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: A-59
A-59
02/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK WEBB, ET AL.
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/20/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/28/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/21/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/10/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/11/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/21/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1944Letter Filed
05/20/1944Motion for Rehearing
04/28/1944Brief in Support of Petition
04/21/1944Brief in Support of Petition
04/10/1944Motion for Rehearing
03/11/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/21/1944Response to Petition
02/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
02/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humble Oil and Refining Company, et al.Respondent
Frank Webb, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information