Case: 02-07-00389-CR
02-07-00389-CR
10/23/2007
Murder
Lester Winningham, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/13/2010 | Letter brief filed | State | |
09/05/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
06/06/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||||
03/22/2011 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||||
03/15/2011 | Order entered | | |||||||
02/16/2011 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||||
01/18/2011 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||||
12/02/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
11/17/2010 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
11/17/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
11/01/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
10/21/2010 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/21/2010 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||||||
10/21/2010 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
10/13/2010 | Letter brief filed | | |||||||
09/14/2010 | Reply to petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
09/07/2010 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
09/07/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
08/31/2010 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
08/19/2010 | Response filed | | |||||||
08/18/2010 | Motion filed | | |||||||
08/06/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
08/05/2010 | Motion to reconsider disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
08/05/2010 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
07/22/2010 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
07/15/2010 | Motion to reconsider filed | | |||||||
07/15/2010 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||||
07/15/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
07/13/2010 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||||
07/01/2010 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||||||
07/01/2010 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||||||
02/01/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||||
03/31/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||||
03/04/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||||
10/01/2008 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/05/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
09/05/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
09/05/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
06/26/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
06/26/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
06/06/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
05/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
05/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
03/13/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||||
03/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
02/11/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
02/11/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
10/25/2007 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
10/23/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/25/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Winningham, Jr., Lester | Criminal - Appellant | William H. 'Bill' Ray |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Steven W. Conder Charles M. Mallin |
Trial Court Information
371st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Mollee Westfall
1004499D
LIFE IDTDCJ