judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER HILLMAN V. ARMELLE HILLMAN

Case Information: 10-FM-0844
Short Caption:PETER HILLMAN V. ARMELLE HILLMANClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1932-09Filed Date:07/07/2010

Opening Event Date:07/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeter Hillman NPro SeN
AppelleeArmelle Hillman N
Jesse A. GadsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 7, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
09/02/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
09/02/2010DISMISSED
09/27/2010MANDATE ISSUED