judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NITTINGER VS. HOLMAN

Case Information: 34747
Short Caption:NITTINGER VS. HOLMANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34917
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356121Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 71762.
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08078
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/17/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11400
12/16/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants-Cook firm and Beckley firm). 99-12722
01/06/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/12/99. To Court Reporter: Associated Court Reporters. 00-00217
01/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Nos. 34747 and 34917. 00-00218
02/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02162
03/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-03651
03/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/27/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. 00-03651