judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. BLANCHE J. STRICKLAND, INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX, ET AL. v. E. E. WARD

Case: A-42
A-42
01/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. BLANCHE J. STRICKLAND, INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX, ET AL.
E. E. WARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/03/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/19/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/31/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/03/1944Reply to Response
02/28/1944Response to Motion filed
02/24/1944Letter Filed
02/23/1944Letter Filed
02/19/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/16/1944Opinion issued
01/31/1944Response to Petition
01/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. E. WardRespondent
Mrs. Blanche J. Strickland, Independent Executrix, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information