Case: 13-06-00598-CV
13-06-00598-CV
10/19/2006
Sanctions
ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC. A/K/A INTERFIRST
MARTIN J. RABALAIS, TINA D. RABALAIS, AND YELLOWFIN CONSTRUCTION, L.L.C.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/26/2007 | Reply brief received | Appellant | |
04/27/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
02/16/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/25/2010 | Case stored | | |||||
01/26/2010 | Exhibits picked up by appropriate attorney of record | | |||||
03/20/2009 | Case stored | | |||||
03/16/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
03/03/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
12/18/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/30/2007 | Submitted | | |||||
07/12/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
07/12/2007 | Submission withdrawn | | |||||
07/12/2007 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/12/2007 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/06/2007 | Response filed | | |||||
07/02/2007 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/02/2007 | Motion filed | | |||||
07/02/2007 | Submitted | | |||||
06/26/2007 | Fee paid | | |||||
06/26/2007 | Motion filed | | |||||
06/26/2007 | Reply brief received | | |||||
06/11/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
04/30/2007 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||
04/27/2007 | Record checked in | | |||||
04/27/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
04/26/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/18/2007 | Telephone call received | | |||||
04/16/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/28/2007 | Oral argument denied | | |||||
03/22/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/15/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/20/2007 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||
02/16/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/16/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
02/16/2007 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
01/22/2007 | Record checked out | | |||||
01/18/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/10/2007 | Motion for extension filed | | |||||
12/19/2006 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
12/18/2006 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
12/06/2006 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
12/06/2006 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/06/2006 | Exhibits received | | |||||
12/06/2006 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
11/29/2006 | No reporters record filed in civil case | | |||||
11/17/2006 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/17/2006 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||
10/20/2006 | Letter received | | |||||
10/19/2006 | Mediation docketing statement returned | | |||||
10/19/2006 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
10/19/2006 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/03/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cocamar, Inc., Caseco USA, Ceasar Anderson, a/k/a Cesear Anderson | Unknown | James H. Robichaux |
ABN Amro Morgage Group | Appellant | Hon. Shirley Selz Hon. Christopher H. Hall |
Martin J. Rabalais, Tina D. Rabalais and Yellowfin | Appellee | Hon. Kevin W. Grillo Hon. Fredrick D. Dreiling Hon. Robert C. Hilliard |
Trial Court Information
214th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Jose Longoria
04-01240-F