Case: 13-05-00514-CV
13-05-00514-CV
08/08/2005
Miscellaneous civil
Michael J. Allein, Dawn M. Allein and in the Interest of Kyle Allein and Misao Wise, Minors
Robert Sanders, Jim Trusty, Re/Max Metro Properties, Inc. and Matthew Dylan Yoakum
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/02/2006 | Record sent to storage | | |||
04/26/2006 | Record Sent | | |||
04/25/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/26/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||
01/25/2006 | Record checked in | | |||
01/25/2006 | Order received from trial court | | |||
01/24/2006 | Record checked out | | |||
11/09/2005 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
11/01/2005 | Letter sent | | |||
10/26/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/26/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/20/2005 | Green card in | | |||
10/11/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/11/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/11/2005 | 10 day letter sent | | |||
10/11/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
09/13/2005 | Notice of no record received | | |||
09/13/2005 | request for documents | | |||
09/09/2005 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
08/23/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
08/09/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
08/09/2005 | Clerk's Record Received | | |||
08/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/25/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Re/Max & Jim Trusty | Appellee | John S. Westcott |
Sanders, Robert | Appellee | Troy B. Williamson, Ii |
Michael J. Allein, et al. | Appellant | Michael W. Williams |
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable J. Manuel Banales
03-05972-D