Case: 05-0628
05-0628
08/08/2005
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
BARBARA SEWELL
SHAUN MALONE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2005 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of Barbara Sewell. Petitioner's mo/re. | |
08/08/2005 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached. | |
08/08/2005 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Barbara Sewell. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
12/19/2005 | Case Stored | G02/12-A-5 | | |
12/12/2005 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the Court of Appeals. | | |
12/02/2005 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
10/18/2005 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/10/2005 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | In regular mail today we received original plus 11 copies. S/W Ms. Nicole Reed. Per Ms. Reed ok to destroy the copies that came in the mail. The mail service had lost their package and out of percaution they hand delivered the same on 10/7/05. | | |
10/07/2005 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of Barbara Sewell. Petitioner's mo/re. | | |
09/23/2005 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/23/2005 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/19/2005 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of Shaun Malone | | |
08/12/2005 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | Summary Judgment from the trial court that was inadvertently left out of the appendix to the pet/rev. On behalf of Barbara Sewell. | | |
08/09/2005 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to Mr. William Warren's office. S/W Helen. Asked if she could send over original + 11 copies of the final judgment from the trial court that was inadvertently left out of the appendix. She will send over ASAP. | | |
08/08/2005 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached. | | |
08/08/2005 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Barbara Sewell. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/19/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/12-A-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sewell, Barbara | Petitioner | Mr. Marshall M. Searcy Jr. Mr. Nicole Reed Kliewer Mr. William N. Warren |
The Women's Center of Tarrant County, Inc. | Other interested party | Ms. Elizabeth M. Fraley |
Malone, Shaun | Respondent | Mr. Randal Craig Shaffer |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-03-00080-CV
Affirmed/Rev & Rem
168 SW3d 243, 06-23-05
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable John H. Cayce
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Kenneth C. Curry
153-189053-01