judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WENDELL G. POOLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0839
Short Caption:WENDELL G. POOLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7782-99Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/12/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWendell G. Poole YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
L. Jackson Thomas, IINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 6, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/12/2010RECORD INDEX
08/12/2010RECORD COPIES
08/12/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/27/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (in letter format) due to prison lockdown. (Served by: DCCA on 9/27/10).
10/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 8, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF(no Appendix attached)
11/29/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on November 10, 2010, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (By: JAC)
12/17/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief. (Served by: DCCA on 12/17/10).
01/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 32 days.
02/08/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/24/11
02/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/01/2011TMC - appellee's motion to extend briefing - motion for summary affirmance
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18pgs/Tape) 4/28/00 proc.
05/12/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...See California v. Anders...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ****MORE****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal is AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR)
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED