judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WOMACK VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34742
Short Caption:WOMACK VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34789
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405576Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Cert/Man/Pro
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 106351.
08/27/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
08/27/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 99-08067
08/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Petition for Writs of Certiorari, Mandamus and/or Prohibition. 99-08068
09/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-08922
10/12/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writs of Certiorari Mandamus and/or Prohibition. 99-09857
10/25/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion of Counsel for Petitioners/Appellants to Withdraw as Counsel. 99-10414
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we grant the petition." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. fn1[Petitioners also argue that the original injunction was entered without proper notice to them. In light of the foregoing disposition, we need not reach this issue]. fn2[On October 25, 1999, petitioners' counsel moved to withdraw under SCR 166. We are inclined to grant the motion. We require counsel to remain on the case for the limited purpose of serving the respondent district judge with the original writ and returning the original writ to this court after service. Upon return of the writ to this court, the motion to withdraw shall be deemed to be granted]. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 99-12614
12/15/1999WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to David N. Frederick for service upon Judge Lee A. Gates. 99-12705
01/05/2000WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Gates on December 28, 1999. 99-12705
01/11/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00431
01/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. regarding Notice of Appearance. 00-18288
11/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Order Dismissing Appeal) nos. 34742/34789. 00-19740