judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASPEN RIDGE LAW OFFICES, P.C. v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION; and GENEVA A. BREWER

Case Heading (06-13)
Case Number:06-13Case Docketed On:01/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:ASPEN RIDGE LAW OFFICES, P.C. v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION; and GENEVA A. BREWER
Full Title:ASPEN RIDGE LAW OFFICES, P.C., Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION; and GENEVA A. BREWER, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAspen Ridge Law Offices, P.C.Galen Bruce Woelk
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Unemployment Insurance DivisionWilliam Larry Weaver
AppelleeGeneva A. Brewer Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Appellate Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate
Opinion Number:2006 WY 129
Citation:143 P.3d 911

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/10/2006Brief - Appellee Wyoming Department of Employment, Unemployment Insurance Commission; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2006Brief - Failure to file - appellee, Geneva A. Brewer.BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
04/24/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/02/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/09/2006Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellee Brewer with change of address.EventPhone CallFinal
10/13/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/31/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/31/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/01/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal