judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRANCIS BELL, ET AL. v. HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY

Case: A-48
A-48
01/31/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FRANCIS BELL, ET AL.
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/07/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/25/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/08/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/24/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/13/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/14/1944Response to Reply filedRespondent
03/04/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/04/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/03/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/21/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/16/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/19/1959Miscellaneous letter
06/08/1944Additional Copies received
06/07/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/07/1944Additional Copies receivedOverruled
05/25/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/08/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/08/1944Response to Motion filed
04/24/1944Supplemental Brief filed
04/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/14/1944Response to Reply filed
03/04/1944Reply to Response
03/04/1944Supplemental Brief filed
03/03/1944Response to Brief filed
02/21/1944Response to Brief filed
02/16/1944Response to Petition
02/15/1944Supplemental Brief filed
02/05/1944Letter Filed
01/31/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyRespondent
Francis Bell, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information