judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34741
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151703Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08057
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 99-09019
01/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 20 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-01400
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/11/00. 00-02306
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09969
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11898
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11898