judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH CRAIG TYSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0838
Short Caption:JOSEPH CRAIG TYSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM728-10Filed Date:07/07/2010

Opening Event Date:07/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/20/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Craig Tyson Y
David H. StringerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Christian Natiello NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (12pgs/Hawkins) 6/1/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (77pgs/Coney) 6/10/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (16pgs/Hunt) 6/11/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (158pgs/Shelton) 6/21/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (225pgs/Shelton) 6/23/10 proc. w/CD included
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 31, 2011 (no oppo)
11/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 31, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 2, 2011 (no oppo)
02/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/1/11. no oppo
05/16/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendfix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until October 31, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 24, 2011, or counsel shall show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #6 (13pgs/Tape) 6/10/10 proc. w/CD
09/20/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
10/05/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to withdraw as counsel and directing briefing
10/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/05/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA David Stringer, Esquire (Appellant)
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to fil the brief and limited appendix on or before March 30, 2012
04/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before May 30, 2012
06/11/2012FiledMotion for leave to file brief of out of time (Appellant)Granted
06/26/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing the appellee's brief within 30 days from the date of this order
06/26/2012FiledBrief w/ appendix attached (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/26/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
07/27/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/28/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
11/28/2012FiledAffirmed
12/20/2012FiledMandate