judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WILL SIMPSON, ET UX. v. HON. ATWOOD MCDONALD, CHIEF JUSTICE, ET AL.

Case: A-47
A-47
01/31/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
WILL SIMPSON, ET UX.
HON. ATWOOD MCDONALD, CHIEF JUSTICE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/22/1944Reply to ResponseRelator
02/19/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/09/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/22/1944Opinion issued
04/20/1944Letter Filed
04/04/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/22/1944Opinion issued
02/22/1944Reply to Response
02/19/1944Response to Petition
02/09/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
01/31/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Will Simpson, et ux.Relator
Hon. Atwood McDonald, Chief Justice, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information