Case: PD-1015-06
PD-1015-06
10/11/2006
PDR Case Type
ELIZONDO, OSBALDO
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/12/2007 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
12/13/2006 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
11/14/2006 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
10/11/2006 | PDR FILED | | |
06/29/2006 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | |
06/29/2006 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/12/2007 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ELIZONDO, OSBALDO | Appellant | Paul Mansur OSBALDO ELIZONDO |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-05-00045-CR
Affirmed
6-21-06
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable JIM B. DARNELL
2004-405,179