Case: 01-04-01225-CV
01-04-01225-CV
11/30/2004
Divorce
Mark Anthony Parmer
Helen Christine Hardcastle Parmer
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/24/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
08/17/2007 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Deny motion | | ||
08/03/2007 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
07/30/2007 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
07/19/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||
06/06/2007 | Submitted | | |||
05/15/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
04/13/2007 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
04/13/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/24/2005 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
10/24/2005 | Brief past due letter sent for CV APE Brf's ONLY. | | |||
05/24/2005 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
05/05/2005 | Brief past due letter sent for CV APE Brf's ONLY. | | |||
04/21/2005 | Order entered | Strike document filed in this Court | | ||
04/18/2005 | Affidavit of indigence | | |||
03/26/2005 | Brief Due | | |||
02/28/2005 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
02/24/2005 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||
02/03/2005 | Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent | | |||
01/13/2005 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |||
01/10/2005 | Affidavit of indigence | Strike document filed in this Court | | ||
01/10/2005 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
01/04/2005 | Appellate filing fee due or appeal may be dismissed | Filing fees in civil cases | | ||
12/22/2004 | Filing fee due per our notice/order. | | |||
12/17/2004 | Docket Statement Due per our Docketing Order | | |||
12/16/2004 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
12/09/2004 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||
12/08/2004 | Affidavit of indigence | | |||
12/08/2004 | Record due | | |||
11/30/2004 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
11/23/2004 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
10/09/2004 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/24/2014 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
03/24/2008 | Retention | Strip file 60 days after issuance of mandate |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Parmer, Helen Christine | Appellee | Helen Christine Parmer |
Parmer, Mark Anthony | Appellant | Mark Anthony Parmer |
Trial Court Information
387th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Hon. Robert J. Kern
03CV132545