Case: 08-03-00446-CR
08-03-00446-CR
10/08/2003
DWI
Jorge Luis Cardenas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/12/2005 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/03/2005 | Submitted | | |||
01/13/2005 | Submission | | |||
09/21/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/21/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/26/2004 | Order entered | | |||
08/26/2004 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/09/2004 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
07/12/2004 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/12/2004 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/26/2004 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/26/2004 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
04/26/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/12/2004 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/12/2004 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/11/2004 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||
02/11/2004 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/02/2004 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||
01/29/2004 | Order entered | | |||
12/15/2003 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
12/12/2003 | Inquiry to Clerk/Reporter Regarding No Record | | |||
12/12/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
12/12/2003 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||
12/09/2003 | Order entered | | |||
12/02/2003 | Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry | | |||
12/01/2003 | Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry | | |||
11/18/2003 | INQUIRY - NOA CERTIFICATE NO RIGHT TO APPEAL | | |||
11/10/2003 | Clerk's Record Received | | |||
10/08/2003 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
10/08/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/02/2005 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza Hon. Tom A. Darnold |
Cardenas, Jorge | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Penny Lee Andersen Hon. M. Clara Hernandez |
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
20030D00371
3 yrs IDTDCJ