judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARLENE CARTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0836
Short Caption:SHARLENE CARTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD23094-09Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/24/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharlene Carter YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
B. Michael Ortwein, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gaillard Hunt, Esquire
08/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 11/17/09 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (4pgs/Tape) 12/7/09 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 2/17/10 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (4pgs/Tape) 4/19/10 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (4pgs/Tape) 4/20/10 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (62pgs/Tape) 6/9/10 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (142pgs/Tape) 6/10/10 proc.
09/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (160pgs/Tape) 6/11/10 proc. w/CD included
09/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/08/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
10/13/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 18, 2010 (no oppo)
10/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 18, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/18/2010APPENDIX (attached to brief)
12/22/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 24, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/24/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
05/11/2011On consideration of appellant's motion for oral argument, and it appearing that this matter is scheduled on the Summary Calendar of May 24, 2011, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this matter that the request is granted. The parties are to be present in the District of Columbia Court of Appeals courtroom, located at 430 E Street, N.W., on the second floor, at 2:25 p.m. on that date. (JAC)
05/24/2011FiledARGUED Before Thompson,Reid,Steadman. Gaillard T.Hunt Esq.,for appellant. B.Michael Ortwein III Esq.,for appellee
05/31/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, retired and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
06/07/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
06/23/2011MANDATE ISSUED