judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBNETT VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34739
Short Caption:ROBNETT VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9705596Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Sprinkel & Burau LLC--check no. 1044.
08/27/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition; Points and Authorities. 99-08042
08/30/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge and all parties to the action in the district court. Due Date: 10 days. 99-08070
08/31/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Service of Writ of Prohibition on Judge Hardesty. 99-08159
08/31/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Service of Writ of Prohibition on K. Sue Trimmer. 99-08179
09/03/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Service of Writ of Prohibition on Judge Hardesty. 99-08308
10/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition for a writ of prohibition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10192
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-11265
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.