judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-136)
Case Number:06-136Case Docketed On:06/15/2006
Linked To: 06-135 , 06-137
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChevron U.S.A., Inc.William J. Thomson II
Randall B. Reed
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Karl D. Anderson
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/15/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (stipulated)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (stipulated)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/13/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
09/15/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/15/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal