judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MOTOR INVESTMENT COMPANY v. CITY OF HAMLIN

Case: A-50
A-50
02/04/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MOTOR INVESTMENT COMPANY
CITY OF HAMLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/07/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/11/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/21/1944Bond
02/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1944Response to Petition
02/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HamlinRespondent
Motor Investment CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information